Gardner v. Galardi South Enterprises Consulting Inc
Plaintiff: Jacinda Gardner
Defendant: Galardi South Enterprises Consulting Inc
Case Number: 4:2013cv03399
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER AND OPINION: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's late-filed Notice of Consent to Join a Collective Action Under the FLSA, (ECF No. 106 ), be STRICKEN from the record. Jackson is not permitted to join this collective action. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/3/2017. (prou, )
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER AND OPINION: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 87 ) is DENIED. In light of this Order, Plaintiff may re-file her motion for class certification under Rule 23. Plaintiff should submit a proposed order with her motion to certify class. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/3/2016.(prou, )
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OPINION AND ORDER denying 85 Motion to Reconsider Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/3/2015.(prou, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Galardi South Enterprises Consulting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinda Gardner
Represented By: James L Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galardi South Enterprises Consulting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?