Neptune v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: William Deleon Neptune
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2014cv03319
Filed: August 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b in the amount of $17,930.25. The court orders Defendant to certify and release the $17,930.25 remainder of the past-due benefits to Counsel. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/8/2017.(gnan )
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act in the stipulated amount of $7,500.00. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/21/2016.(gnan )
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court ADOPTS the findings of the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 23), REVERSES the final decision of the Commissioner denying Plaintiff's claim for Disability Insurance Benefits, and REMANDS the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this decision pursuant to sentence four (4) of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/27/2016. (gnan, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neptune v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Deleon Neptune
Represented By: Beatrice E Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?