Timmons et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: James Timmons and Shelly Timmons
Defendant: United States of America, Olukayode Akinjala, Health Partners of South Carolina Inc and Conway Medical Center Inc
Case Number: 4:2015cv00638
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Defendant United States of America's [ECF No. 31 ] motion to dismiss and Defendant Conway Medical Center, Inc.'s [ECF No. 32 ] motion to dismiss, both of which were converted to motions for summary judgment, are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against the United States are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims against CMC are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 1/26/2017. (hcic, )
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CONSENT ORDER TO DISMISS OLUKAYODE AKINJALA, M.D. AND HEALTH PARTNERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 11/15/2016. (hcic, )
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CONSENT ORDER TO HOLD SCHEDULING ORDER IN ABEYANCE. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 11/10/2016. (hcic, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT ORDER TO PERMIT EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 3/2/2016. (hcic, )
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The motion to dismiss by the government defendants (ECF No. 12 ) and the motion to dismiss by CMC (ECF No. 6 ) are denied without prejudice. The plaintiffs' motion to amend the scheduling order 11 is granted. Counsel should submit a proposed amended scheduling order within ten (10) days after all defendants have filed an answer. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 2/24/2016. (hcic, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timmons et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Timmons
Represented By: Ronald E Alexander
Represented By: Carl Lewis Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Timmons
Represented By: Ronald E Alexander
Represented By: Carl Lewis Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olukayode Akinjala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Partners of South Carolina Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?