Spallone v. SoHo University Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert Spallone
Defendant: SoHo University Inc and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2015cv01622
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION UNDER FLSA. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 2/9/2016. (hcic, ) (Main Document 56 replaced on 2/9/2016 with corrected document) (hcic, ).
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RULE 16(a)(1) ORDER. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 1/8/2016. (hcic, )
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO EXTEND STAY AND TOLL STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 12/22/2015. (hcic, )
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO STAY ACTION AND TOLL STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 10/13/2015. (hcic, )
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: In its previous order 27 , this Court found that the Wage Payment Act is broader than the FLSA in that it applies to all wages due, not simply minimum wage and overtime, and is based on alleged lack of written notice of all deductions. However, the Court indicated that the preemption issues had not been fully briefed and that "granting a motion to dismiss on that basis (preemption) would thus be premature." (ECF No. 27 , p. 9) Therefore, at the ple ading stage, this Court found that the motion to dismiss on the basis of preemption should be denied. To clarify the previous order, the defendants are not precluded from filing a dispositive motion after discovery on the basis of preemption. Defendants may also include in a dispositive motion any arguments regarding the Fourth Circuit's recent Trejo case. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 10/6/2015. (hcic, )
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 8/31/2015. (hcic, )
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO ALLOW ELECTRONIC SERVICE. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 6/17/2015. (hcic, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spallone v. SoHo University Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Spallone
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoHo University Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?