Cox v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Theodore M Cox
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 4:2015cv03265
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Berkeley
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2017 Filing 34 STIPULATION for Award of Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (Bowens, Barbara)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Attorney Fees under EAJA in the amount of $6,400.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on May 1, 2017.(gnan )
April 28, 2017 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access of Justice Act by Theodore M Cox. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's fee agreement with EAJ A assignment, #2 Time sheet of Robertson Wendt, #3 Declaration of Sarah H. Bohr, #4 Declaration of Curtis J. Fisher)No proposed order.(Wendt, Robertson)
February 16, 2017 Filing 29 JUDGMENT: The Commissioner's decision is reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and the case is remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative action. (gnan )
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision be reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and that the case be REMANDED to the Commissioner for further administrative action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 2/16/2017. (gnan )
April 25, 2016 Filing 25 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE BRIEF by Theodore M Cox. (Wendt, Robertson)
April 7, 2016 Filing 24 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Response Brief Due by 4/25/2016 (Bowens, Barbara)
February 24, 2016 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Theodore M Cox. Defendant Brief due by 4/7/2016. (Wendt, Robertson)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Rogers, III Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/25/2016. (gnan )
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff's brief now due by 2/24/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 1/25/2016.(gnan )
January 25, 2016 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Theodore M Cox. (Wendt, Robertson). (Modified on 1/25/2016 to replace document with corrected document). (gnan ).
January 25, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Theodore M Cox. Response to Motion due by 2/11/2016. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Wendt, Robertson)
December 21, 2015 Filing 13 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Volume 2 of 2. (Attachments: #1 Addendum Documents Related to Administrative Process/Oral Hearing 04-03-2015, #2 Addendum Payment Documents and Decisions 04-03-2015, #3 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and notices 04-03-2015, #4 Addendum Non Disability Related Developments 04-03-2015, #5 Addendum Disability Related Developments 04-03-2015, #6 Addendum Medical Records 04-03-2015 Part 1, #7 Addendum Medical Records 04-03-2015 Part 2, #8 Addendum Medical Records 04-03-2015 Part 3, #9 Addendum Medical Records 04-03-2015 Part 4)(Bowens, Barbara)
December 21, 2015 Filing 11 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Volume 1 of 2. (Attachments: #1 Addendum Index, #2 Addendum Documents Related to Administrative Process/Oral Hearing 09-04-2013, #3 Addendum Payment Documents and Decisions 09-04-2013, #4 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 09-04-2013, #5 Addendum Non Disability Related Developments 09-04-2013, #6 Addendum Disability Related Developments 09-04-2013, #7 Addendum Medical Records 09-04-2013 Part 1, #8 Addendum Medical Records 09-04-2013 Part 2, #9 Addendum Medical Records 09-04-2013 Part 3)(Bowens, Barbara)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Answer. Answer now due by 12/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/21/2015.(gnan )
December 21, 2015 Filing 9 ANSWER by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 1/25/2016.(Bowens, Barbara)
December 18, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Response to Motion due by 1/7/2016. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Bowens, Barbara)
September 17, 2015 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore M Cox. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 8/20/2015, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 12/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certified receipts)(Wendt, Robertson)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 8/18/2015.(gnan )
August 18, 2015 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 12/21/2015. (gnan )
August 17, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Theodore M Cox. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2015. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(gnan )
August 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Theodore M Cox. Service due by 12/18/2015.(gnan )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore M Cox
Represented By: Robertson H Wendt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?