Robinson v. Ragland et al
Plaintiff: Gary Lavon Robinson
Defendant: Thomas Ragland, Nikon Morgan, Christopher Dillard, Faith Chappell and Jason Palmer
Case Number: 4:2015cv03472
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/10/2017. (dsto, )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: The Court hereby appoints Paul T. Collins of Nelson Mullins Riley& Scarborough as counsel for Gary Lavon Robinson in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/05/2017. (dsto, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court has carefully reviewed the Report, the parties' objections, relevant filings, and applicable law and concludes that the Magistrate Judge accurately summarized the appli cable law. The Report recommends that the motion for summary judgment be denied in part such that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Ragland, Dillard, and Morgan for excessive force survive summary judgment. ECF No. 59 . After careful conside ration, IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Supplement to the Report, ECF Nos. 87 , 89 , are ACCEPTED. Accordingly, Defendants' motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 59 , is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth i n the Report. In light of this Court's acceptance of the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation resulting in the excessive force claim surviving summary judgment, the Magistrate Judge is hereby directed: (i) to appoint counsel to repr esent the Plaintiff; (ii) to hold a hearing with the parties and their counsel to seek Consent to conduct all proceedings in this matter, including trial, before the Magistrate Judge; and (iii) to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 03/23/2017. (dsto, )
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Plaintiff's first Motion to Compel (doc. # 30 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Plaintiff's second Motion to Compel (doc. # 31 ) is denied as moot with instructions for Defendants to re-send their responses to the Plaintiff and file a copy with the court within five days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's third Motion to Compel (Doc.# 38 ) is dismissed as duplicative of the first and second Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/14/2016.(dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Ragland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lavon Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?