McBroom v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kerry W McBroom
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2015cv04087
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: G Ross Anderson
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b in the amount of $44,402.00. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/19/2019.(gnan,)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees under the EAJA (ECF No. 26) is granted in the amount of $5,399.07 ($5,378.88 + 20.19 in expenses) to be paid in accordance with the Commissioner's procedures set forth in her response. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/7/2017.(gnan )
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT: The case is reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanded to the Commissioner for further consideration. (gnan )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBroom v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry W McBroom
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?