Sittner v. Country Club Inc et al
Plaintiff: Candace Sittner
Defendant: Country Club Inc and Mike Kap
Case Number: 4:2015cv05043
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO STAY ACTION. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 1/27/2017. (hcic, )
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Defendant's motions to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint and to compel arbitration, or in the alternative stay litigation [ECF # 6 and ECF # 7 ] are GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint [ECF # 1 ] is STA YED pending the outcome of the arbitration. The parties involved in the arbitration proceeding must complete arbitration within six months from the date of this Order. At the conclusion of six months from the date of this Order, the Clerk is instructed to lift the stay in this case, unless notified by the parties to lift the stay at an earlier date. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 7/13/2016. (hcic, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO ALLOW ELECTRONIC SERVICE. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 3/2/2016. (hcic, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sittner v. Country Club Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Sittner
Represented By: Michael G Corley
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Club Inc
Represented By: Trenton H Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kap
Represented By: Trenton H Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?