Sampson v. Latta Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Charles Sampson
Defendant: Latta Police Department, SLED and Dillon County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 4:2016cv02821
Filed: August 11, 2016
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Dillon
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 114 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts and incorporates by reference Magistrate Judge's the R & R [ECF No. 109 ]. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendant Bethea's motion for summary judgment [ECF No. 101 ] and DISMISSES this action with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/15/2018. (prou, )
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 98 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts and incorporates by reference Magistrate Judge's the R & R [ECF No. 93 ]. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [ECF No . 69 ], GRANTS Defendant Jones' and Defendant Cartwright's motions for summary judgment [ECF Nos. 71 & 72 ], and DISMISSES Defendants Jones and Cartwright from this action with prejudice. This case remains pending as to Defendant Bethea. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 2/9/2018. (prou, )
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court hereby adopts and incorporates the R & R [ECF No. 11 ] by reference and DISMISSES the Latta Police Department, SLED, and the Dillon County Sheriff's Office from this a ction without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to amend [ECF No. 13 ] and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to SUBSTITUTE Derrick Cartwright, Andy Bethea, and Troy Jones as the named defendants in this case. The Court RECOMMITS this matter to the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial handling. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/12/2017. (mcot, )
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/26/2016. (mcot, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson v. Latta Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latta Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?