Fuerte et al v. Convergys Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Cynthia Fuerte and Terry Dimery |
Defendant: |
Convergys Corporation and Convergys Customer Management Group Inc |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv00701 |
Filed: |
March 14, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Carolina |
Office: |
Florence Office |
County: |
Horry |
Presiding Judge: |
R Bryan Harwell |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2018 |
Filing
48
ORDER on Motions 10 , 35 , and 42 : This Court grants Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent Plaintiffs' seek to pursue their claims in a representative capacity as collective and/or class action cl aims, and those claims are dismissed with prejudice. [ECF # 35 ]. However, Plaintiffs' individual FLSA violations and breach of contract claims remain before this Court as independent claims by the two individual Plaintiffs involved in this laws uit (Terry Dimery and Charlotte Jones). Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Class Certification and Notice is DENIED. [ECF # 10 ]. Defendants Motion to Strike Consent to Join by Lashea Moore is GRANTED. [ECF # 42 ]. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 03/26/2018. (lsut, )
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 24 ) is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' Motion to Hold in Abeyance (ECF No. 25 ) is hereby dismissed as moot in light of this Order. Plaintiff Fuerte is dismissed from this case, with prejudice. Plaintiffs' counsel shall have up to seven (7) days from the date this Order is filed to file a declaration from Charlotte Jones. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Class Certi fication within 45 days from the date Charlotte Jones' declaration is filed or Plaintiffs' deadline to do so expires. Defendants' answer to the Complaint shall be due within seven (7) days of the date this Order is filed. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 5/30/2017. (hcic, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?