Sheppard v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Sheppard
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2017cv00724
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiff failed to show he requested review by the Appeals Council in a timely manner (and still has not done so). The Government was never served with the Complaint due to this problem, and thus did not respond for that reason. The Government is not in default, and the court lacks jurisdiction to resolve this case. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/12/2017. (gnan, )
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: The court dismisses the Complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. (gnan ) Modified on 3/29/2017 to correct clerical error. (gnan ).
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 3/17/2017. (gnan )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheppard v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?