Brantley v. Aiken County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Russell A. Brantley
Defendant: Aiken County Detention Center, Southern Health Partners, James Staten, Lt. Hettich and Captain Gallum
Case Number: 4:2017cv00814
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Aiken
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court has thoroughly reviewed the record and concurs in the 73 recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. For the reasons stated herein and in the Report and Reco mmendation, Defendants' motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 57 , 58 ) are granted. Defendants Hettich and Gallam's motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution (ECF No. 64 ) is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/20/2018. (prou, )
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court concurs in the Report and Recommendation 41 and incorporates it herein by reference. Defendant Staten's motion to quash and dismiss (ECF No. 34 ) is denied without pr ejudice.The court is informed that, subsequent to the issuance of the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, the United States Marshal's Service again served attempted service on Defendant James Staten by providing a copy of the summ ons and complaint to Lt. Shawn Carlen. ECF No. 46 . THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL'S SERVICE IS DIRECTED TO CONTACT DEFENDANT STATEN'S COUNSEL, AMY HARMON GEDDES AND/OR JAMES G. LONG, III, AT NEXSEN PRUET, LLC, 1230 MAIN STREET, SUITE 700, COLUMBIA, SOUTH CAROLINA, 20202, TELEPHONE 803-771-8900 TO ASCERTAIN IF COUNSEL WILL ACCEPT SERVICE OR TO OBTAIN AN ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT STATEN. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 08/9/2017. (dsto, )
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RULING ON 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court concurs in the Report and Recommendation and incorporates it herein by reference. Plaintiff's complaint is summarily dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process as to Defendants ACDC and Southern Health Partners only. The case is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial handling. Signed by the Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 6/13/2017. (hcic, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley v. Aiken County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell A. Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aiken County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Staten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Gallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?