Bates v. Vandroff et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Bates
Defendant: Sylvia Tawanda Vandroff, Trina Clarkson, Marolyn D. Vandroff, Elizabeth Kinder, Shardice Sharp, Brenda Robinson and Kylee Martin
Case Number: 4:2017cv01838
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT 142 Order granting 134 Motion for Failure to Comply Rule 37(b), (a), and (e). Signed by Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 04/20/2021. (dsto, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 134 Motion for Failure to Comply Rule 37(b), (a) and (e). Signed by Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 04/16/2021.(dsto, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: The Court finds no clear error, adopts the Report, and incorporates the Report by reference herein. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 100 , which the Court construes as one for default judgme nt, is GRANTED as to Defendant ELI Solutions, LLC. Plaintiff is awarded $400.00 actual damages, and ELI Solutions, LLC is hereby ORDERED to return all original materials submitted by Plaintiff to ELI Solutions, LLC. Plaintiffs motion is DENIED as to all other defendants, and the remainder of this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 07/14/2020. (lgib, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 The Court will construe Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 98 ) as a Motion for Entry of Default, which is GRANTED as to Defendant ELI Solutions, LLC, and DENIED as to Defendant Sylvia Vandroff. Also pendin g is Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 100 ) in which he seeks a determination of liability and damages. Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to provide any and all supplemental briefing and/or additi onal evidence in support of his Motion for Summary Judgment. Thereafter, Defendant Sylvia Vandroff shall have thirty-four (34) days to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion. Briefing/Evidence due by plaintiff on or before January 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/07/2020.(dsto, )
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's first R&R (ECF No. 52 ), DENIES Plaintiff's second motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 46 ), and DIRECTS the Clerk to enter a defaul t against Defendant Marolyn D. Vandroff pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a); and ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's second R&R (ECF No. 63 ), DENIES Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (ECF No. 57 ), and DISMISSES Defendants Elizabeth Kinder, Brenda Robinson, Trina Clarkson, Shardice Sharp, Kylee Martin, and Another Chance Publishing without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m).IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 04/23/2019. (dsto, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Compel; denying 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/29/2019.(dsto, )
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/16/2018.(dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Vandroff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Tawanda Vandroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trina Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marolyn D. Vandroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shardice Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kylee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?