United States of America v. Brautigam
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Horst Brautigam
Case Number: 4:2018cv01760
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America (Barnett, John); Modified on 8/24/2018 to correct event type.(prou, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 19 Rule 26(f) Report by United States of America. (Barnett, John) Modified on 8/24/2018 to remove attachment and file separately as document #20 (prou, ).
August 10, 2018 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #17 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail to Horst Brautigam, 3301 Lakeshore Drive, Florence, SC, 29501. (prou, )
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/10/2018. (prou, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Horst Brautigam. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #11 Order to Notify of Address Change w/NEF, #12 Conference and Scheduling Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail to Horst Brautigam, 3301 Lakeshore Drive, Florence, SC, 29501 (dsto, )
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/9/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/23/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 8/23/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/18/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/19/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/17/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/17/2018, Discovery due by 2/15/2019, Motions due by 3/4/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/16/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 7/1/2019, ADR Statement due by 4/1/2019, Mediation Due by 5/1/2019. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to July 1, 2019.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 07/20/2018. (dsto, )
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing defendant to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D. West on 07/20/2018. (dsto, ) Modified on 8/24/2018 to edit text (prou, ).
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Horst Brautigam. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (lsut, )
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Horst Brautigam. Service due by 9/25/2018. (lsut, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America. (lsut, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horst Brautigam, filed by United States of America. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Brautigam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horst Brautigam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Douglas Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?