Humana Insurance Company v. Bi-Lo LLC
Plaintiff: Humana Insurance Company
Defendant: Bi-Lo LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02151
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 09/27/2018. (lsut, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Response now due October 23, 2018. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 9/27/2018.(tmcb, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Patrick Abate ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8017343) by Humana Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 10/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Vanderbloemen, Thomas) Modified on 9/26/2018 to remove proposed order (lsut, ).
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Extending Deadline to 10/23/2018 by Humana Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 10/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Vanderbloemen, Thomas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Bi-Lo LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Holt, Ryan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Humana Insurance Company. Bi-Lo LLC served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Return Receipt Card)(Vanderbloemen, Thomas)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Humana Insurance Company.(Vanderbloemen, Thomas)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bi-Lo LLC. Service due by 11/5/2018. (lsut, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Humana Insurance Company. (lsut, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bi-Lo LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7926614), filed by Humana Insurance Company. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humana Insurance Company v. Bi-Lo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Edward Vanderbloemen
Represented By: Michael Patrick Abate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bi-Lo LLC
Represented By: Ryan Charles Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?