Clardy v. Thor Motor Coach Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sonny Clardy
Defendant: Camping World Inc, Thor Motor Coach Inc and Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02453
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC, Thor Motor Coach Inc.(Malloy, Kevin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC, Thor Motor Coach Inc.(Malloy, Kevin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sonny Clardy.(Bruorton, James)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Horry County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Malloy, Kevin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/15/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/29/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 10/29/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/27/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/23/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/22/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/22/2019, Discovery due by 4/23/2019, Motions due by 5/8/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/22/2019, ADR Statement due by 6/8/2019, Mediation Due by 7/8/2019. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 09/03/2019. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 09/25/2018. (lsut, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC. (lsut, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Thor Motor Coach Inc. (lsut, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Camping World Inc. (lsut, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thor Motor Coach Inc. (lsut, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-26-04273 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7981637), filed by Camping World Inc, Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Amended Complaint and Summons) (lsut, ). Modified on 9/25/2018 to add to main document an attachment that was filed in #5 and #6 (lsut, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clardy v. Thor Motor Coach Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Clardy
Represented By: James A Bruorton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World Inc
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Kamper Company of Columbia LLC
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?