Mays v. Lewis
Petitioner: Javan Fredrick Mays and Von Frederick Mayes
Respondent: Warden Scott Lewis
Case Number: 4:2018cv03234
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Susannah R Cole on behalf of Scott Lewis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cole, Susannah)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Scott Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #10 Order 2254 w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail to Javan Fredrick Mays, #250287, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER authorizing service of process. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 2/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition)(dsto, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX300079451 (dsto, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #5 Proper Form Order w/NEF and AO240, placed in U.S. Mail to Javan Fredrick Mays, #250287, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 12/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/10/2018. (dsto, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (dsto, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Javan Fredrick Mays. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javan Fredrick Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Von Frederick Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Scott Lewis
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Represented By: Susannah R Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?