Harris v. OneMain Financial, Inc

Plaintiff: Jean Harris
Defendant: OneMain Financial, Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv03536
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to Stay. This case is stayed pending arbitration. The parties shall provide a Joint Status Report no later than July 1, 2019. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/22/2019.(tmcb, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Court Proceedings and to Order Arbitration by OneMain Financial, Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Elliott, David)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to OneMain Financial, Inc. Service due by 3/20/2019. (lsut, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jean Harris. (lsut, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OneMain Financial, Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8172611), filed by Jean Harris. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. OneMain Financial, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneMain Financial, Inc
Represented By: David Alan Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Harris
Represented By: Penny Hays Cauley
Represented By: William Kyle Geddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?