Brady v. Myrtle Beach, City of et al
Plaintiff: James Brady
Defendant: Myrtle Beach, City of, State of South Carolina, Metro Properties Group LLC, David Sebok and Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00107
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Myrtle Beach, City of.(Battle, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Brady.(Brittain, Thomas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Thomas C Brittain for 3/7/19-3/25/19, 6/6/19-6/7/19 (Brittain, Thomas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation.(MacDonald, Susan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation.(MacDonald, Susan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant David Sebok's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Sebok.(MacDonald, Susan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant David Sebok's ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by David Sebok.(MacDonald, Susan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan P MacDonald on behalf of Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation, David Sebok (MacDonald, Susan) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/11/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user) (lsut, ).
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marvin Connor on behalf of Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation, David Sebok (Connor, Andrew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by James Brady.(Brittain, Thomas)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/4/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/19/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/19/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/15/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/14/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/14/2019, Discovery due by 8/13/2019, Motions due by 8/28/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/12/2019, ADR Statement due by 9/28/2019, Mediation Due by 10/28/2019.Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection.. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days fter the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 01/06/2020. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/15/2019. (lsut, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Myrtle Beach, City of. (lsut, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-CP-26-00685 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8208236), filed by Myrtle Beach, City of. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents - Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Documents - Answer to Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Documents - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Certificate of Service) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Myrtle Beach, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrtle Beach, City of
Represented By: Michael Warner Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Properties Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sebok
Represented By: Andrew Marvin Connor
Represented By: Susan P MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Marvin Connor
Represented By: Susan P MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brady
Represented By: Thomas C Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?