IP86 LLC v. Stonewall Villas LLC et al
Plaintiff: IP86 LLC
Defendant: Hilts Construction LLC, Pamela Cecala, Stonewall Villas LLC, Taylor Architecture PA, Mark Hilts and Founders Development LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00156
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by IP86 LLC. Taylor Architecture PA served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit acceptance of service)(Lightsey, Wallace)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by IP86 LLC. Pamela Cecala served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Acceptance of service)(Lightsey, Wallace)
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by IP86 LLC. Founders Development LLC served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Acceptance of Service)(Lightsey, Wallace)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP86 LLC. Hilts Construction LLC served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lightsey, Wallace)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP86 LLC. Mark Hilts served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lightsey, Wallace)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Pamela Cecala, Founders Development LLC, Mark Hilts, Hilts Construction LLC, Taylor Architecture PA. Service due by 5/13/2019. (lsut, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pamela Cecala, Mark Hilts, Hilts Construction LLC, Taylor Architecture PA, filed by IP86 LLC. Service due by 5/13/2019 (Lightsey, Wallace)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP86 LLC. Stonewall Villas LLC served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lightsey, Wallace)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP86 LLC. Taylor Architecture PA served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lightsey, Wallace)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP86 LLC. Pamela Cecala served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lightsey, Wallace)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED : #1 Complaint and #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to 508filings@loc.gov. Confirmation attached. (lsut, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (lsut, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pamela Cecala, Mark Hilts, Hilts Construction LLC, Stonewall Villas LLC, Taylor Architecture PA. Service due by 4/18/2019. (lsut, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IP86 LLC. (lsut, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela Cecala, Mark Hilts, Hilts Construction LLC, Stonewall Villas LLC, Taylor Architecture PA (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8218420), filed by IP86 LLC. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IP86 LLC v. Stonewall Villas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilts Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Cecala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonewall Villas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Architecture PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hilts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Founders Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IP86 LLC
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Camden Navarro Massingill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?