Honda of South Carolina Mfg., Inc. et al v. Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: Honda of South Carolina Mfg Inc, Honda R&D Americas Inc, American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda R&D Americas, Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda of South Carolina Mfg., Inc.
Defendant: John Doe 3, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 4:2019cv00229
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/19/2019.(cbru, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Disclosure of Subscriber Information by American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda R&D Americas Inc, Honda of South Carolina Mfg Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Mergo, Nikole)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3. Service due by 4/29/2019. (lsut, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Honda R&D Americas Inc. (lsut, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Honda R&D Americas Inc. (lsut, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Honda of South Carolina Mfg Inc. (lsut, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Honda of South Carolina Mfg Inc. (lsut, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (lsut, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (lsut, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8232369), filed by Honda of South Carolina Mfg Inc, American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda R&D Americas Inc. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honda of South Carolina Mfg., Inc. et al v. Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honda of South Carolina Mfg Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honda R&D Americas Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honda R&D Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honda of South Carolina Mfg., Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?