Pope v. Bull

Plaintiff: Robert Pope
Defendant: Diana Sue Bull
Case Number: 4:2019cv00360
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document #13 Rule 26(f) Report. First attachment description: Waiver of 26(a)(1) Disclosures . (Barrett, R)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Diana Sue Bull.(Barrett, R)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Diana Sue Bull. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, R) Additional attachment filed as entry #15 on 3/28/2019 (cbru, ).
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: This case having been recently reassigned to the Honorable Mary G. Lewis, the parties' attention is hereby directed to the new controlling scheduling and mediation orders. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/21/2019. (cbru, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/21/2019. (cbru, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 4/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/3/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/2/2019, Discovery due by 9/3/2019, Motion in Limine due by 12/16/2019, Motions due by 9/16/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/2/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/6/2020, Mediation Due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/21/2019. (cbru, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/25/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/2/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/1/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/1/2019, Discovery due by 9/30/2019, Motions due by 10/15/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/30/2019, ADR Statement due by 11/16/2019, Mediation Due by 12/16/2019. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 02/03/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 03/04/2019. (lsut, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Pope.(Barrett, R)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert Pope.(Barrett, R)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Pope re #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued to Defendant Diana Sue Bull (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service with greencard)(Jennings, Douglas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Diana Sue Bull. Service due by 5/9/2019. (lsut, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Pope. (lsut, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diana Sue Bull (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8256861), filed by Robert Pope. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pope v. Bull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Sue Bull
Represented By: R Hawthorne Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pope
Represented By: Gerald Edward Harmon, Jr
Represented By: Douglas Edmund Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?