Broadcast Music Inc et al v. O' Neal Burroughs LLC et al

Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp, Rondor Music International Inc, Spirit One Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, House of Fun Music Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. and Broadcast Music Inc
Defendant: O' Neal Burroughs LLC and O'Neal Davis
Case Number: 4:2019cv00391
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #24 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Pro Se Party's Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, and a copy of the court's pro se litigant guide, placed in U.S. Mail to O'Neal Davis, 9668 N. Kings Highway, Myrtle Beach, SC, 29572, and a copy of #24 Proper Form Order w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail to O'Neal Burroughs, LLC, 9668 N. Kings Highway, Myrtle Beach, SC, 29572. (prou, )
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROPER FORM ORDER: Defendant Davis is advised that he has 30 days (plus three mailing days) to obtain counsel for Defendant O'Neal Burroughs LLC, doing business as Whiskey Beach Bar and Grill. Defendant Davis is further directed to complete, sign, and return the attached Pro Se Party's Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories in 30 days (plus three mailing days). Failure to comply with court rules could have serious consequences including, but not limited to, striking a defense, striking a pleading, and/or holding the party in default. Case to be brought into proper form by 4/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/26/2019. (prou, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER Entry #15 Reason: Entry #20 was filed explaining fax. (dsto, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 14 TEXT Order placed in U.S. Mail to O'Neal Davis, 9668 N. Kings Highway, Myrtle Beach, SC, 29572, and O'Neal Burroughs, LLC, 9668 N. Kings Highway, Myrtle Beach, SC, 29572 (dsto, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D. West. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 03/08/2019. (dsto, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from O'Neal Davis (by fax). (dsto, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by O'Neal Davis, O' Neal Burroughs LLC. (received by fax, original not received) (Attachments: #1 Articles of Incorporation)(dsto, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #1 Complaint, #8 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to 508filings@loc.gov. (lsut, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (lsut, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stone Diamond Music Corp, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Rondor Music International Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, House of Fun Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Spirit One Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stone Diamond Music Corp, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Rondor Music International Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, House of Fun Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Spirit One Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc. O' Neal Burroughs LLC served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to O'Neal Davis, O' Neal Burroughs LLC. Service due by 5/13/2019. (lsut, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broadcast Music Inc. (lsut, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, House of Fun Music Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to 26.01 Interrogatories - Schedule 7.1) (lsut, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O'Neal Davis, O' Neal Burroughs LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8262579), filed by Stone Diamond Music Corp, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Rondor Music International Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, House of Fun Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Spirit One Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint - Schedule of Songs) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. O' Neal Burroughs LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit One Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Meets Girl Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Fun Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O' Neal Burroughs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Neal Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?