Rogers v. Clayton Homes Florence et al
Plaintiff: Casey Ervin Rogers
Defendant: Clayton Homes Florence, Southern Energy Homes Inc and CMH Homes Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00570
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion. Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Response filed by CMH Homes Inc, Clayton Homes Florence, Southern Energy Homes Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice and Agreement to Transact Business Electronically, #2 Exhibit B - Opinion and Order - Taylor v. JD Motors, #3 Exhibit C - Unpublished Opinions) (Barnwell, Brian)Modified on 03/28/2019 to correct event type. (lsut, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Response filed by Casey Ervin Rogers.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/21/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Retailer Closing Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sales Agreement)(Shuler, Mary Amanda) Modified on 3/18/2019 to add descriptions to exhibits (lsut, ).
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by CMH Homes Inc, Clayton Homes Florence, Southern Energy Homes Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Retail Closing Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Tennessee Secretary of State Business Entity Detail, #4 Exhibit C - Ala. Sec. of State Business Entity Detail, #5 Exhibit D - Data Plate, #6 Exhibit E - DRA)No proposed order.(Barnwell, Brian)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Williamsburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment for Filing the Notice of Removal)(Barnwell, Brian)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CMH Homes Inc, Clayton Homes Florence, Southern Energy Homes Inc. (lsut, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamsburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-45-00033 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8290891), filed by Southern Energy Homes Inc, Clayton Homes Florence, CMH Homes Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Alabama Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit C - Tennessee Secretary of State, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Jackson, #5 Exhibit E - Retailer Closing Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - SC Secretary of State's Business Name Search) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Clayton Homes Florence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Homes Florence
Represented By: Allen Mattison Bogan
Represented By: Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Energy Homes Inc
Represented By: Allen Mattison Bogan
Represented By: Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes Inc
Represented By: Allen Mattison Bogan
Represented By: Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Ervin Rogers
Represented By: Mary Amanda Harrelson Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?