Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd.
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01525
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd..Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ryan M. Suerth)(Anderson, James)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/22/2019.(cbru, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristen F. Mazzeo (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-8567827) by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rawl, A) Modified to edit text on 7/22/2019 (cbru, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J. Cawley (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-8567821) by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rawl, A) Modified to edit text on 7/22/2019 (cbru, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Rawl, A)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Ryan McAndrew Suerth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/15/2019.(mdea )
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan McAndrew Suerth ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8555600) by Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd.. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application for Admission, #2 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Anderson, James) Modified on 7/15/2019 to correct attachment descriptions (mdea, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/9/2019. (cbru, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/6/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/5/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/5/2019, Discovery due by 1/6/2020, Motion in Limine due by 4/17/2020, Motions due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/3/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 5/8/2020, Mediation Due by 3/19/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/9/2019. (cbru, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than July 19, 2019. (cbru, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule, #3 Exhibit C - Policy)No proposed order.(Rawl, A) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2019 (cbru, ).
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (cbru, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd.(cbru, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8465468) filed by Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd. Service due by 8/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Named Windstorm Policy)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristen Frances Mazzeo
Represented By: Michael Joseph Cawley
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gator Myrtle Beach Partners, Ltd.
Represented By: James Taylor Anderson, III
Represented By: Ryan McAndrew Suerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?