Weber et al v. United Property & Casualty Ins Co
Plaintiff: Janis Weber and Daniel Weber, Jr.
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Ins Co
Case Number: 4:2019cv01595
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel Weber, Jr, Janis Weber.(McCoy, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by United Property & Casualty Ins Co.(LaFave, Mary) Modified to edit text on 7/9/2019 (cbru, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by United Property & Casualty Ins Co.(LaFave, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by United Property & Casualty Ins Co.(LaFave, Mary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10. Reason: Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures are not filed pursuant to Rule 5(d) FRCivP. (cbru, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7. Reason: An incorrect ECF login was used. Corrected Filing Document Number #8 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel Weber, Jr, Janis Weber.(McCoy, Daniel)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/4/2019. (cbru, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 7/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/2/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/3/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/1/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/1/2019, Discovery due by 12/2/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/3/2020, Mediation Due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/4/2019. (cbru, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by United Property & Casualty Ins Co.(cbru, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United Property & Casualty Ins Co.(cbru, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-26-02441 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8481604)filed by United Property & Casualty Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Department of Insurance Letter)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber et al v. United Property & Casualty Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Weber
Represented By: Daniel Ray McCoy
Represented By: Dirk J Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Weber, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Ray McCoy
Represented By: Dirk J Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Ins Co
Represented By: Mary Daniel LaFave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?