Brown v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lou Ellen Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 4:2019cv01647
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lou Ellen Brown re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, (Kellahan, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a) by Lou Ellen Brown. Plaintiff's counsel has indicated that she served the Commissioner with the complaint and she will serve notice of this dismissal as well. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Plaintiff)(gnan ) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct event type per chambers.(gnan ).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has not complied with docket entry # 6 Text Order requiring the completion of Form AO239 (Long Form) by June 24, 2019. Plaintiff is Ordered to respond appropriately within five (5) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 6/25/2019. (gnan, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is ordered to fully complete Form AO 239, Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees of Costs(Long Form) and follow all the instructions. Plaintiff's attorney can find this form at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/fee-waiver-application-forms/application-proceed-district-court-without-prepaying-fees-or Plaintiff is Ordered to complete the form within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 6/10/2019. (gnan, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 9/5/2019. (gnan )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Lou Ellen Brown. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019. No proposed order. Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(gnan )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Lou Ellen Brown. Service due by 9/5/2019.(gnan )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Ellen Brown
Represented By: Jennifer R Kellahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?