Edmunds v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Margaret Patterson Edmunds
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 4:2019cv01710
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SCX400014145 (dsto, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Margaret Patterson Edmunds: On the sole issue of this Report and Recommendation, it is recommended that the Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees be denied. It is recommended upon adoption of this report and recommendation that Plaintiff be ordered to pay the full filing fee within 14 days of the order by the district judge. Objections to R&R due by 7/1/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 6/17/2019. (gnan, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 9/12/2019. (gnan )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Margaret Patterson Edmunds. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. No proposed order. Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(gnan )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Margaret Patterson Edmunds. Service due by 9/12/2019.(gnan )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmunds v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Patterson Edmunds
Represented By: Beatrice E Whitten
Represented By: William Thomas Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?