Dons Car Crushing, Inc v. Hull Forest Products, Inc
Plaintiff: Dons Car Crushing, Inc
Defendant: Hull Forest Products, Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01734
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Dons Car Crushing, Inc.(Ford, Patrick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Hull Forest Products, Inc.(Hoefer, Paul)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Hull Forest Products, Inc.(Hoefer, Paul)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Hull Forest Products, Inc.(Hoefer, Paul)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dons Car Crushing, Inc.(Ford, Patrick)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 07/10/2019. (lsut, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam B. Marks ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8546211) by Hull Forest Products, Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application/Affidavit Pro Hac Vice - Adam B. Marks, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing - Adam B. Marks, #3 Proposed Order proposed Order - pro hac vice admission - Adam B. Marks)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hoefer, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/5/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/5/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/29/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2019, Discovery due by 1/27/2020, Motions due by 2/11/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/27/2020, ADR Statement due by 3/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to June 1, 2020. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 06/01/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 07/01/2019. (lsut, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Hull Forest Products, Inc.(Hoefer, Paul)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Hull Forest Products, Inc answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails with counsel confirming extension)(Hoefer, Paul)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Williamsburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Hoefer, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hull Forest Products, Inc. (lsut, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamsburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-45-00196 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8509205), filed by Hull Forest Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint filed Williamsburg County, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dons Car Crushing, Inc v. Hull Forest Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dons Car Crushing, Inc
Represented By: Patrick Buel Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hull Forest Products, Inc
Represented By: Paul Hamilton Hoefer
Represented By: Adam B Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?