Kelly et al v. Hauner et al
Plaintiff: Clara Lewis Brockington and Marcus D. Kelly
Defendant: Public Storage Cashua Drive Office, Mr. Ronald L. Hauner, Jr., Danielle Jones, Public Storage Corporate Office, Nathan Batchelor, Public Storage of Florence, South Carolina and Mr. Ronald L. Havner, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01752
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #22 No-SERVE Order w/NEF, #23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Clara Lewis Brockington, 912 Harmony Street, Florence, SC, 29501 (dsto, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court dismiss the Complaint in this case with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Any state law claims are recommended to be dismissed without prejudice so that Plaintiff may pursue such claims in state court. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/14/2019. (dsto, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/14/2019. (dsto, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nathan Batchelor, Ronald L. Havner, Jr., Danielle Jones, Public Storage Corporate Office, Public Storage of Florence, South Carolina, filed by Clara Lewis Brockington. Service due by 11/4/2019.(dsto, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #16 Second Proper Form Order w/NEF, Civil Complaint Form, (4)Summons and (4)USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Clara Lewis Brockington, 912 Harmony Street, Florence, SC, 29501 (dsto, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 8/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/18/2019. (dsto, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ronald L. Havner, Jr., Danielle Jones, Public Storage Corporate Office, Nathan Batchelor, filed by Clara Lewis Brockington. Service due by 10/15/2019.(dsto, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF and Non-prisoner Complaint form, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Marcus D. Kelly, 912 Harmony Street, Florence, SC, 29501 (dsto, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Complaint Form for a Civil Case, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Clara Lewis Brockington, 912 Harmony Street, Florence, SC, 29501 (dsto, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re: #8 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/25/2019.(dsto, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 7/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/25/2019. (dsto, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Clara Lewis Brockington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Clara Lewis Brockington. Response to Motion due by 7/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald L. Hauner, Jr, Danielle Jones, Public Storage Corporate Office, filed by Marcus D. Kelly and Clara Lewis Brockington. Service due by 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Hauner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Lewis Brockington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus D. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Storage Cashua Drive Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Ronald L. Hauner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Storage Corporate Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Storage of Florence, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Ronald L. Havner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?