Johnson v. United Parcel Services
Plaintiff: LaKena Johnson
Defendant: United Parcel Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv01767
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response is now due August 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 07/24/2019.(dsto, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LaKena Johnson. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Rhodes, Janet)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Parcel Services. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's 3/9/18 Charge)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Thomas, Christopher)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United Parcel Services.(Thomas, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Stanton Hill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/12/2019.(prou, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nancy Elizabeth Rafuse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/12/2019.(prou, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stanton Hill ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8552117) by United Parcel Services. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application and Affidavit for Pro HAc Vice Admission - J. Stanton Hill, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Thomas, Christopher)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy Elizabeth Rafuse ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8552067) by United Parcel Services. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application and Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Nancy E Rafuse, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Thomas, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LaKena Johnson. United Parcel Services served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service)(Rhodes, Janet)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United Parcel Services. (prou, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by LaKena Johnson.(prou, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Parcel Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8517417.), filed by LaKena Johnson. Service due by 9/18/2019.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. United Parcel Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaKena Johnson
Represented By: Janet Elizabeth Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Services
Represented By: Nancy E Rafuse
Represented By: J Stanton Hill
Represented By: Christopher Ray Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?