Johnson et al v. PGBA LLC et al

Plaintiff: Myra Banks and Emma Johnson
Defendant: PGBA LLC and Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina
Case Number: 4:2019cv01778
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 4/20/2020, Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/9/2019. (prou, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/7/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/5/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/5/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/5/2019, Discovery due by 2/3/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/11/2020, Motions due by 2/18/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/4/2020, Mediation Due by 4/20/2020. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury. selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after June 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/9/2019. (prou, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina, PGBA LLC.(Haselden, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina, PGBA LLC.(Haselden, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina, PGBA LLC. (prou, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Myra Banks.(prou, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Emma Johnson.(prou, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina, PGBA LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8518705.), filed by Emma Johnson, Myra Banks. Service due by 9/19/2019.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. PGBA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Banks
Represented By: Aaron Vernon Wallace
Represented By: Anthony Martin Ibarra
Represented By: Donald Gist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Johnson
Represented By: Aaron Vernon Wallace
Represented By: Anthony Martin Ibarra
Represented By: Donald Gist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PGBA LLC
Represented By: D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Represented By: Thomas Foster Haselden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina
Represented By: D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Represented By: Thomas Foster Haselden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?