White v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc
Plaintiff: Deidra L White
Defendant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01870
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT: Based on the parties' consent, the Court grants the parties' Consent Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff Deidra L. White's claims brought in this action are to be arbitrated pursuant to the Arbitration Agreement. Dismissal of this matter is appropriate and is dismissed without prejudice. (prou, )
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION: Based on the parties' consent, the Court grants the parties' Motion, ECF No. #7 . Plaintiff's claims brought in this action are to be arbitrated pursuant to the Arbitration Agreement. As all claims in the instant litigation are arbitrable, dismissal of this matter is appropriate. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 8/16/2019.(prou, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Quisenberry, Brian) Modified on 8/15/2019 to delete proposed order. (dsto)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc answer due 8/14/2019. (Quisenberry, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidra L White. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents US Postal Green Card)(Clark, Pheobe)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc. (prou, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deidra L White.(prou, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8533613.), filed by Deidra L White. Service due by 9/30/2019.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra L White
Represented By: Pheobe A Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store Inc
Represented By: Brian Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?