Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581 v. Sage Sailing Inc et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581
Defendant: Sagepost LLC, Henry Owens, Melloney Owens, David Wyatt Sage, Jr, Delanie Sage, David Wyatt Sage, Sage Sailing Inc, Charles H Post, David W Sage, Jr and David W Sage
Case Number: 4:2019cv01883
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry Owens, Melloney Owens.(Bluestein, S)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 10/10/2019 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/26/2019. (abuc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/16/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/23/2020, Discovery due by 2/24/2020, Motion in Limine due by 4/22/2020, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 5/22/2020, Mediation Due by 3/23/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/26/2019. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 8/26/2019 (abuc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Henry Owens, Melloney Owens.(Bluestein, S)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charles H Post, David W Sage, David W Sage, Jr, Delanie Sage, Sage Sailing Inc, Sagepost LLC.(Collins, David) Modified to correct filers on 8/26/2019 (abuc).
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581 by David W Sage, Sage Sailing Inc, Charles H Post, Delanie Sage, David W Sage, Jr, Sagepost LLC.(Collins, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by S Scott Bluestein on behalf of Henry Owens, Melloney Owens (Bluestein, S)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mills Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581 (Kennedy, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Henry Owens, Melloney Owens, Charles H Post, David W. Sage, David W. Sage, Jr, Delanie Sage, Sage Sailing Inc, Sagepost LLC. Service due by 10/1/2019. (lsut, ) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit text (lsut, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581. (lsut, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henry Owens, Melloney Owens, Charles H Post, David Wyatt Sage, David Wyatt Sage, Jr, Delanie Sage, Sage Sailing Inc, Sagepost LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8536528), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581 v. Sage Sailing Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagepost LLC
Represented By: David Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Owens
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melloney Owens
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wyatt Sage, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delanie Sage
Represented By: David Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wyatt Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sage Sailing Inc
Represented By: David Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H Post
Represented By: David Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Sage, Jr
Represented By: David Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Sage
Represented By: David Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. SA10115-R6-17581
Represented By: Robert Mills Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?