U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. HM Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: HM Solutions, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Shermiah Townsend, Tiffany Nicole Moultrie, Alonzo Cooper and Tarrell Monique Hudson
Case Number: 4:2019cv02043
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/3/2019. (prou, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/23/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/7/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/7/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/26/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/27/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/27/2020, Discovery due by 3/25/2020, Motions due by 4/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/23/2020, Mediation Due by 6/8/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to August 3, 2020. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after August 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/3/2019. (prou, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Intervenor Complaint by HM Solutions, Inc..(Schanen, Giles)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS #15, #16, and #17 Reason: Documents were duplicate filings of document #14. Corrected Filing Document Number #14 . (prou, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alonzo Cooper, Shermiah Townsend, Tiffany Nicole Moultrie, Tarrell Monique Hudson.(Ortner, Leon) Modified on 8/23/2019 to add filers listed on document (prou, ).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting protection [ECF No. #7 ] as to Judge Kaymani D. West. This Order does not afford protection from any appearance required before the district court judge assigned to this case, although he may separately grant such protection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/22/2019. (prou, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION filed by Tarrell Monique Hudson, Alonzo Cooper, Shermiah Townsend, Tiffany Nicole Moultrie.(prou, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE: IT IS, THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Tarrell Monique Hudson, Tiffany Nicole Moultrie, Shermiah Townsend, and Alonzo Cooper, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sharon W. Cooper's Motion to Intervene, ECF No. #10 , is granted. Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint in Intervention will begin and service will be effected when the Clerk dockets the Complaint in Intervention. As the Complaint in Intervention amends the Complaint, Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in Intervention in accordance with Rule 15(a)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/22/2019.(prou, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Tarrell Monique Hudson, Tiffany Nicole Moultrie, Shermiah Townsend, Alonzo Cooper, As Personal Representative of the Estate of Sharon W. Cooper. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint filed by EEOC, #2 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention (Proposed))Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Ortner, Leon)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by HM Solutions, Inc..(Schanen, Giles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HM Solutions, Inc..(Schanen, Giles)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Rachael Suzanne Steenbergh for Monday, October 14, 2019 through Wednesday, October 23, 2019 and Monday, December 9, 2019 through Tuesday, December 17, 2019 (Steenbergh, Rachael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. HM Solutions, Inc. waiver executed on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Executed)(Steenbergh, Rachael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (dsto, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(dsto, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HM Solutions, Inc., filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Service due by 10/21/2019.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. HM Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HM Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Rachael Suzanne Steenbergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shermiah Townsend
Represented By: Leon Martin Ortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tiffany Nicole Moultrie
Represented By: Leon Martin Ortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alonzo Cooper
Represented By: Leon Martin Ortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tarrell Monique Hudson
Represented By: Leon Martin Ortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?