IG Development Corp et al v. Colonial Charters Lender LLC
Plaintiff: IG Development Corp and Sunnehanna Corp
Defendant: Colonial Charters Lender LLC
Counter Defendant: The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC and NCL Development, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02320
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service on The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service)(Dukes, Dennis)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service on NCL Development, LLC NCL Development, LLC served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt and Acknowledgment of Acceptance of Service)(Dukes, Dennis)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to NCL Development, LLC, The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC. Service due by 1/6/2020. (lsut, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim #8 by IG Development Corp, Sunnehanna Corp.(Neill, Mark)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/25/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/3/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/2/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/30/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/27/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/27/2020, Discovery due by 3/27/2020, Motions due by 4/13/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/25/2020, ADR Statement due by 5/10/2020, Mediation Due by 6/10/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 08/03/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 10/07/2019. (lsut, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Answer and, COUNTERCLAIM For Declaratory Judgment against IG Development Corp, NCL Development, LLC, Sunnehanna Corp, The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colonial Charters Lender, LLC Deed, #2 Exhibit B - IG Development Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Sunnehanna Corp. Deed, #4 Exhibit D - BB&T - Deed 3601-1183, #5 Exhibit E - BB&T - Deed 3601-1199, #6 Exhibit F - Atlas SC 1 SPE LLC - Deed 3601-1243, #7 Exhibit G - Apex Homes - Deed 3629-1831, #8 Exhibit H - The New Island Green Golf Course - Deed 3629-2364, #9 Exhibit I - The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC - Deed 3703-2367, #10 Exhibit J - New Island Green Country Club, Inc. - Deed 3872-2510, #11 Exhibit K - Plat 112-92, #12 Exhibit L - Plat 220-190, #13 Exhibit M - Plat 222-122)(Dukes, Dennis)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Consent #9 Motion to join required parties, NCL Development, LLC and The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 10/7/2019.(tmcb, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 Consent Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by IG Development Corp, Sunnehanna Corp.(Neill, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Responses of Parties Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by IG Development Corp, Sunnehanna Corp.(Neill, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Consent Rule 26(f) Report by IG Development Corp, Sunnehanna Corp.(Neill, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Joinder CONSENT MOTION TO JOIN REQUIRED PARTIES by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dukes, Dennis)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Defendant's First Amended Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM For Declaratory Judgment against All Plaintiffs by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colonial Charters Lender, LLC Deed, #2 Exhibit B - IG Development Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Sunnehanna Corp. Deed, #4 Exhibit D - BB&T - Deed 3601-1183, #5 Exhibit E - BB&T - Deed 3601-1199, #6 Exhibit F- Atlas SC 1 SPE LLC - Deed 3601-1243, #7 Exhibit G - Apex Homes - Deed 3629-1831, #8 Exhibit H - The New Island Green Golf Course - Deed 3629-2364, #9 Exhibit I - The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC - Deed 3703-2367, #10 Exhibit J - New Island Green Country Club, Inc. - Deed 3872-2510, #11 Exhibit K - Plat 112-92, #12 Exhibit L - Plat 220-190, #13 Exhibit M - Plat 222-122)(Dukes, Dennis)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IG Development Corp, Sunnehanna Corp.(Neill, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY by IG Development Corp, Sunnehanna Corp to #4 Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal,,,, Counterclaim,,, . (Neill, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/19/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/3/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/3/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/2/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/30/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/27/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/27/2020, Discovery due by 3/27/2020, Motions due by 4/13/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/25/2020, ADR Statement due by 5/10/2020, Mediation Due by 6/10/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to August 3, 2020. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 08/03/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 08/30/2019. (lsut, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM For Declaratory Judgment against IG Development Corp, Sunnehanna Corp by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colonial Charters Lender, LLC Deed, #2 Exhibit B - IG Development Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Sunnehanna Corp. Deed, #4 Exhibit D - BB&T - Deed 3601-1183, #5 Exhibit E - BB&T - Deed 3601-1199, #6 Exhibit F - Atlas SC 1 SPE LLC - Deed 3601-1243, #7 Exhibit G - Apex Homes - Deed 3629-1831, #8 Exhibit H - The New Island Green Golf Course - Deed 3629-2364, #9 Exhibit I - The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC - Deed 3703-2367, #10 Exhibit J - New Island Green Country Club, Inc. - Deed 3872-2510, #11 Exhibit K - Plat 112-92, #12 Exhibit L - Plat 220-190, #13 Exhibit M - Plat 222-122)(Dukes, Dennis)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. (lsut, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-26-03307 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8619559), filed by Colonial Charters Lender LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Lis Pendens, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Notice of Waiver of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to State Court of Removal) (lsut, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user) (lsut, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IG Development Corp et al v. Colonial Charters Lender LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IG Development Corp
Represented By: Mark D Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunnehanna Corp
Represented By: Mark D Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Charters Lender LLC
Represented By: Dennis Charles Dukes, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The Plantation at Colonial Charters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: NCL Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?