Watson et al v. Highland Industries Inc
Plaintiff: Roger Craig Watson and Anna R Watson
Defendant: Highland Industries Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv02338
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson, Kyle Morrell, Laurie Morrell, John E Stokes, Catherine W Martin, George W Martin, Sue Ann Lewis.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-02338-DCC, 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC(Poliakoff, Gary)
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/31/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/7/2019, Disclosure of Second Real Estate allowed until 10/31/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/9/2019, Discovery due by 2/24/2020, Motion in Limine due by 4/13/2020, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 5/4/2020, Mediation Due by 4/9/2020, Pretrial Disclosures due by 04/13/2020. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/3/2019. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC, 4:19-cv-02338-DCC (lsut, ) Modified on 10/15/2019 to edit text (lsut, ). Modified on 10/17/2019 to edit text (lsut, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting (27) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 4:18-cv-03143-DCC. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/03/2019. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC, 4:19-cv-02338-DCC. (lsut, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct (15 in 4:19-cv-02338-DCC, 15 in 4:19-cv-02338-DCC) Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Motions,, (16 in 4:19-cv-01252-DCC) Scheduling Order,, (16 in 4:19-cv-01253-DCC) Scheduling Order,, (16 in 4:19-cv-01251-DCC) Scheduling Order,, (22 in 4:18-cv-03143-DCC) Scheduling Order,, by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson, Kyle Morrell, Laurie Morrell, John E Stokes, Catherine W Martin, George W Martin, Sue Ann Lewis. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-02338-DCC, 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC(Poliakoff, Gary)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: granting #17 Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 4:19-cv-02338-DCC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 4:18-cv-03143-DCC; granting (19) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 4:19-cv-01253-DCC; granting (19) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 4:19-cv-01252-DCC; granting (19) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 4:19-cv-01251-DCC. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 09/19/2019. Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-02338-DCC, 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC (lsut, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Highland Industries Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-02338-DCC, 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC(Willis, Richard)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting (23) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:18-cv-03143-DCC for Purposes of Discovery; granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:19-cv-01253-DCC for Purposes of Discovery; granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:19-cv-01252-DCC for Purposes of Discovery; granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:19-cv-01251-DCC for Purposes of Discovery; granting (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:19-cv-02338-DCC for Purposes of Discovery. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/16/2019.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-02338-DCC, 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC(abuc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/9/2019, Discovery due by 2/24/2020, Motion in Limine due by 4/13/2020, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/13/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 5/4/2020, Mediation Due by 4/9/2020. Motions granted: #14 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Scheduling Order, filed by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/16/2019. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 9/16/2019 (abuc).
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Scheduling Order,, by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Poliakoff, Gary)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Discovery Plan and Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson.(Poliakoff, Gary)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-02338-DCC, 4:18-cv-03143-DCC, 4:19-cv-01251-DCC, 4:19-cv-01252-DCC, 4:19-cv-01253-DCC(Poliakoff, Gary)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson.(Poliakoff, Gary)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 10/21/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/10/2019. (abuc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/25/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/19/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/7/2020, Discovery due by 3/9/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/7/2020, Motions due by 3/23/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/18/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/8/2020, Mediation Due by 4/6/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/10/2019. (abuc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Response to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Highland Industries Inc.(Willis, Richard)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Highland Industries, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Highland Industries Inc.(Willis, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Roger Craig Watson, Anna R Watson. All Defendants. (Poliakoff, Gary)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Highland Industries Inc. Service due by 11/18/2019. (lsut, ) Modified on 8/21/2019 to edit case number (lsut, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anna R Watson, Roger Craig Watson. (lsut, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Highland Industries Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8622738), filed by Roger Craig Watson, Anna R Watson. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. Highland Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Industries Inc
Represented By: Ashleigh Rayanna Wilson
Represented By: Richard H Willis
Represented By: Ethan Robert Ware
Represented By: Jessica JO King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Craig Watson
Represented By: Raymond P Mullman, Jr
Represented By: Gary W Poliakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna R Watson
Represented By: Raymond P Mullman, Jr
Represented By: Gary W Poliakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?