Tillman v. Highland Industries Inc et al
Plaintiff: Janet Tillman
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Corporation, Highland Industries Inc and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2019cv02563
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Highland Industries Inc.(Wilson, Ashleigh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Highland Industries Inc.(Wilson, Ashleigh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Janet Tillman.(Harrell, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY: The Court held a telephonic Rule 16 conference with the parties. The parties are directed to submit a proposed amended scheduling order, a Rule 26(f) report, and responses to Local Rule 26.03 Interrogatories within 14 days. (lsut, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/18/2019. (mcot, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Janet Tillman. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Harrell, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Janet Tillman.(Harrell, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Chesterfield County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acknowledgement of Receipt of Filed Copy of Notice of Removal)(Willis, Richard)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 10/21/2019 11:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/12/2019. (abuc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/2/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/26/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/23/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/10/2020, Discovery due by 3/10/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/11/2020, Motions due by 3/24/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/18/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/8/2020, Mediation Due by 4/7/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/12/2019. (abuc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 9/25/2019 (abuc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Highland Industries Inc.(swel, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Highland Industries Inc.(swel, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chesterfield County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-13-00566. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8662415), filed by Highland Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(swel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Highland Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Industries Inc
Represented By: Ashleigh Rayanna Wilson
Represented By: Richard H Willis
Represented By: Ethan Robert Ware
Represented By: Jessica JO King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Tillman
Represented By: Robert William Harrell, III
Represented By: John D Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?