Zeigler v. United States Department of Agriculture
Plaintiff: Benjamin T Zeigler
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency
Case Number: 4:2019cv02633
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment/Dispositive Motion due by 2/15/2020. Defendant's response/cross-motion due by 3/15/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 11/15/2019. (hcic, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Regarding Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency. (Drake, Beth)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/18/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/2/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/27/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/25/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/26/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/26/2020, Discovery due by 5/25/2020, Motions due by 6/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/24/2020, ADR Statement due by 7/10/2020, Mediation Due by 8/10/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to October 5, 2020. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 10/05/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 10/28/2019. (lsut, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency.(Drake, Beth)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency.(Drake, Beth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin T Zeigler. United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Ipock, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Drake on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency (Drake, Beth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 12/18/2019. (lsut, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Benjamin T Zeigler. (lsut, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8674727), filed by Benjamin T Zeigler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -September 20, 2018 Request, #2 Exhibit B - October 2, 2019 email, #3 Exhibit C - November 19, 2018 email, #4 Exhibit D - November 7, 2018 email, #5 Exhibit E - January 3, 2019 email, #6 Exhibit F - January 29, 2019 email, #7 Exhibit G - February 19, 2019 email, #8 Exhibit H - March 7, 2019 email, #9 Exhibit I - September 10, 2019 email) (lsut, ) Modified on 9/19/2019 to add descriptions to Exhibits. (dsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeigler v. United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin T Zeigler
Represented By: Charles Epps Ipock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?