Osborn v. Horry County Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Hafida Osborn
Defendant: Horry County Sheriff's Department, Jeannette Benton, Chief Joe Hill, Jack Johnson, Horry County Police Department, Amy Hardwick, Mathew Singleton, Sheriff Phillip E. Thompson, Pansy Rabon, Michael Benton and Wayne Owens
Case Number: 4:2019cv02765
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to #17 Roseboro Order. Response filed by Pansy Rabon.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 28 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 26 TEXT Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Pansy Rabon, 2584 Magnolia Hwy., Aynor, SC, 29511 (dsto, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Time is extended until November 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/14/2019.(dsto, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Horry County Sheriff's Department, Wayne Owens, Phillip E. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chandler, J W)
November 12, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Hafida Osborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Witness List, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hunt, Bonnie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeannette Benton, Michael Benton re #20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories (Smith, Lawrence)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Amy Hardwick, Joe Hill, Horry County Police Department, Jack Johnson, Mathew Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kozacki, J)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jeannette Benton, Michael Benton.(Smith, Lawrence)
November 10, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and/or 12(c), F.R.C.P. by Hafida Osborn. Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Hunt, Bonnie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #17 Roseboro Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Pansy Rabon, 2584 Magnolia Hwy., Aynor, SC, 29511 (dsto, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM(Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and/or 12(c), F.R.C.P. Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/08/2019. (dsto, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Bradley Smith on behalf of Jeannette Benton, Michael Benton (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Lawrence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #14 Order to Notify of Address Change w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Pansy Rabon, 2584 Magnolia Hwy., Aynor, SC, 29511 (dsto, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing pro se defendant to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/08/2019. (dsto, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #7 and #10 by Horry County Sheriff's Department, Wayne Owens, Phillip E. Thompson serving pro se Def Pansy Rabon with ECF 7 and 10 (Chandler, J W) Modified on 11/8/2019 to link correct event to associated event. (dsto)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Horry County Sheriff's Department, Wayne Owens, Phillip E. Thompson.(Chandler, J W)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and/or 12(c), F.R.C.P. by Amy Hardwick, Joe Hill, Horry County Police Department, Jack Johnson, Mathew Singleton. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Kozacki, J)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/28/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 11/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/6/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/4/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/5/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/5/2020, Discovery due by 5/4/2020, Motions due by 5/19/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/3/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/8/2020, ADR Statement due by 6/19/2020, Mediation Due by 7/20/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to September 8, 2020.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/07/2019. (dsto, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Amy Hardwick, Joe Hill, Horry County Police Department, Jack Johnson, Mathew Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kozacki, J) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit text. (dsto)
October 6, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hafida Osborn.(Hunt, Bonnie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Horry County Sheriff's Department, Wayne Owens, Phillip E. Thompson.(Chandler, J W)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Horry County Sheriff's Department, Wayne Owens, Phillip E. Thompson.(dsto, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-26-5108 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8693904), filed by Wayne Owens, Horry County Sheriff's Department, Phillip E. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborn v. Horry County Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: James Matthew Johnson
Represented By: J W Nelson Chandler
Represented By: Amanda Kurzen Dudgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Benton
Represented By: Lawrence Bradley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Joe Hill
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Johnson
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County Police Department
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Hardwick
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Singleton
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Phillip E. Thompson
Represented By: James Matthew Johnson
Represented By: J W Nelson Chandler
Represented By: Amanda Kurzen Dudgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pansy Rabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Benton
Represented By: Lawrence Bradley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Owens
Represented By: James Matthew Johnson
Represented By: J W Nelson Chandler
Represented By: Amanda Kurzen Dudgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hafida Osborn
Represented By: Bonnie Travaglio Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?