Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Bell
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music Inc, Lord and Walker Publishing, Sloopy II Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Coral Reefer Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Rondor Music International Inc, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Cracklin Music, Groper Music, Combine Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Unichappell Music Inc, Cotillion Music Inc and Bro 'N Sis Music Inc
Defendant: LJ Bell LLC, Larry Bell and Jill Partfitt-Bell
Case Number: 4:2019cv02892
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unichappell Music Inc, Combine Music Corp, Rondor Music International Inc, Groper Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Sloopy II Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Bocephus Music Inc, Bro 'N Sis Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Lord and Walker Publishing, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Cracklin Music, Coral Reefer Music. Jill Partfitt-Bell served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ellis, Bernie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unichappell Music Inc, Combine Music Corp, Rondor Music International Inc, Groper Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Sloopy II Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Bocephus Music Inc, Bro 'N Sis Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Lord and Walker Publishing, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Cracklin Music, Coral Reefer Music. Larry Bell served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ellis, Bernie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unichappell Music Inc, Combine Music Corp, Rondor Music International Inc, Groper Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Sloopy II Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Bocephus Music Inc, Bro 'N Sis Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Lord and Walker Publishing, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Cracklin Music, Coral Reefer Music. LJ Bell LLC served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ellis, Bernie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: #1 Complaint and #6 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to 508filings@loc.gov. Confirmation attached. (lsut, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (lsut, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Larry Bell, LJ Bell LLC, Jill Partfitt-Bell. Service due by 1/13/2020.(lsut, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broadcast Music Inc. (lsut, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bocephus Music Inc, Bro 'N Sis Music Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Combine Music Corp, Coral Reefer Music, Cotillion Music Inc, Cracklin Music, Gregmark Music Inc, Groper Music, Lord and Walker Publishing, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Sloopy II Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Schedule 7.1) (lsut, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry Bell, LJ Bell LLC, Jill Partfitt-Bell (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8719331), filed by Unichappell Music Inc, Combine Music Corp, Rondor Music International Inc, Groper Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Sloopy II Inc, Cotillion Music Inc, Bocephus Music Inc, Bro 'N Sis Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Lord and Walker Publishing, Rhythm Wrangler Music, Cracklin Music, Coral Reefer Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Schedule of Songs) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord and Walker Publishing
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sloopy II Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregmark Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Reefer Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhythm Wrangler Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cracklin Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groper Music
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bro 'N Sis Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJ Bell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Partfitt-Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?