Reaves v. Marion County School District et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Reaves,
Defendant: Waymon Edmunds, Adrienne Johnson, Marion County Board of Directors, Creek Bridge Stem Academy, Stacy Wilbanks, Latonya Yates Ford, Marion County School District, Paula Grant, Rachel Caulder and Kandace Bethea
Case Number: 4:2019cv02922
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Order and #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kathy Reaves, 421 W. Mullins St., Marion, SC 29571. (lbak)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiff notifies the court within the time set for filing objections to this Report and Recommendation that she wishes to continue with this case and complies with the court's prior orders, the Clerk is directed to vacate this Report and Recommendation and return the file to the undersigned for further handling. If, however, no objections are filed, the Clerk shall forward this Report and Recommendation to the district judge for disposition. Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 11/19/2019. (lbak)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 11/19/2019. (lbak)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, #7 Order, one standard complaint form, one Summons, 10 Forms USM-285 and one 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kathy Reaves, 421 W. Mullins St., Marion, SC 29571. (lbak)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in her #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by November 14, 2019, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 11/14/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/24/2019. (lbak)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Motion granted: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/24/2019. (lbak) Modified on 10/24/2019 to edit text. (lbak)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kathy Reaves,. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kathy Reaves,. (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves v. Marion County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waymon Edmunds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creek Bridge Stem Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Wilbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latonya Yates Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Caulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandace Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Reaves,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?