Taylor v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Ken Taylor
Defendant: Deputy R. Williams, Ebony Black, Sergeant Kyle W. Center, Lieutenant Tim Wilson, Spartanburg County Detention Center, Deputy R. Simpson, Amber S. Menditto, Major Allen Freeman, Sergeant Joclyn R. Gray, Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Wright, Deputy Dustin Peace, Allane Roach, Deputy J. L. Hall, Sergeant Jeremy R. Thomas, Deputy Mulholland, Spartanburg County and Deputy J. Gallman
Case Number: 4:2019cv03235
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/7/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/21/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/16/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/16/2020, Discovery due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 6/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/14/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/19/2020, Mediation Due by 8/31/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at no later than September 28, 2020. Written responses are due seven (7) days thereafter. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/18/2019. (dsto, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Ebony Black, J. Gallman, Dustin Peace, R. Williams.(Walsh, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ken Taylor Of Deputy Bill Simpson Without Prejudice (Atkinson, Charles)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ken Taylor. J. Gallman served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service- Gallman)(Atkinson, Charles)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Spartanburg County, Spartanburg County Detention Center, Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Wright.(Darwin, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Spartanburg County, Spartanburg County Detention Center, Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Wright. (Darwin, Andrew)
December 1, 2019 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER Entry No. 7,8,9 & 10 Reason: to correct filing errors. Corrected Filing Document Number #12 , #13 , and #14 . (dsto, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ken Taylor. Dustin Peace served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service- Deputy Peace)(Atkinson, Charles)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ken Taylor. Ebony Black served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; R. Williams served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UPS Proof of Service- Black, #2 Exhibit UPS Proof of Service- Williams)(Atkinson, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) by Ken Taylor as to J. Gallman, R. Simpson, R. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service-Gallman, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service- Williams, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service- Simpson)(Atkinson, Charles)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Walsh, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ken Taylor.(Atkinson, Charles)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 12/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/18/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/18/2020, Discovery due by 5/18/2020, Motions due by 6/1/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/17/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/21/2020, Mediation Due by 7/31/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at no later than August 31, 2020. Written responses are due seven (7) days thereafter. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/19/2019. (dsto, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kyle W. Center, Allen Freeman, Joclyn R. Gray, J. L. Hall, Amber S. Menditto, Deputy Mulholland, Allane Roach, Jeremy R. Thomas and Tim Wilson. (dsto, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Kyle W. Center, Allen Freeman, Joclyn R. Gray, J. L. Hall, Amber S. Menditto, Deputy Mulholland, Allane Roach, Jeremy R. Thomas and Tim Wilson.(dsto, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-42-4020. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8779398), filed by Jeremy R. Thomas, Allen Freeman, J. L. Hall, Kyle W. Center, Amber S. Menditto, Deputy Mulholland, Allane Roach, Tim Wilson, Joclyn R. Gray. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy R. Williams
Represented By: James P Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Black
Represented By: James P Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Kyle W. Center
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Tim Wilson
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County Detention Center
Represented By: Andrew Todd Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy R. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber S. Menditto
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Allen Freeman
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Joclyn R. Gray
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Andrew Todd Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Wright
Represented By: Andrew Todd Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Dustin Peace
Represented By: James P Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allane Roach
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J. L. Hall
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jeremy R. Thomas
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Mulholland
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County
Represented By: Andrew Todd Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J. Gallman
Represented By: James P Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Taylor
Represented By: Charles Daniel Atkinson
Represented By: Michael BT Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?