Ridgeway v. Horry County Police Dept.
Plaintiff: Jodi Ridgeway
Defendant: Horry County Police Dept.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03501
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
2 Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jodi Ridgeway.(Hunt, Bonnie)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Horry County Police Dept..(Buyck, Mark)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Horry County Police Dept..(Buyck, Mark)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/2/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/1/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/1/2020, Discovery due by 7/3/2020, Motions due by 9/3/2020, Mediation Due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/06/2020. (egra, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Horry County Police Dept..(Buyck, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jodi Ridgeway.(Hunt, Bonnie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jodi Ridgeway. (egra, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-2606920. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8833038), filed by Horry County Police Dept. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridgeway v. Horry County Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County Police Dept.
Represented By: Mark W Buyck, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Ridgeway
Represented By: Bonnie Travaglio Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?