Kinard v. Walmart Stores East LP et al
Plaintiff: Amy Kinard
Defendant: Walmart Stores East LP, John Does 1-2 and Wendy Wenner
Case Number: 4:2020cv01794
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Amy Kinard.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/9/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Hunnicutt, Daniel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Wendy Wenner.(Laffitte, Rebecca)
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP, Wendy Wenner. Response to Motion due by 7/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Laffitte, Rebecca)
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP, Wendy Wenner.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/26/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Cook v. Lowe's, #2 Exhibit 1B - Griggs v. Dollar General, #3 Exhibit 1C - Mobley v. Wal-Mart)(Laffitte, Rebecca)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/8/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/10/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/7/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2020, Discovery due by 2/5/2021, Motions due by 2/22/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/6/2021, ADR Statement due by 3/22/2021, Mediation Due by 4/21/2021. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to the date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 6/6/2021. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 6/12/2020. (hcic, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP.(Laffitte, Rebecca) (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/11/2020 with corrected document provided by filer) (hcic, ).
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP.(Laffitte, Rebecca) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/11/2020 with corrected document provided by filer) (hcic, ).
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP.(Laffitte, Rebecca) (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/11/2020 with corrected document provided by filer) (hcic, ).
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP.(Laffitte, Rebecca)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Kinard. Wendy Wenner served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of service)(Hunnicutt, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amy Kinard. Response to Motion due by 6/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hunnicutt, Daniel)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amy Kinard on Wendy Wenner (Hunnicutt, Daniel)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Amy Kinard. (Hunnicut, Daniel) Modified on 6/1/2020 to correct event type. (hcic, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Wendy Wenner. Service due by 8/26/2020 (hcic, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East LP, John Does 1-2, and Wendy Wenner, filed by Amy Kinard. Service due by 8/25/2020 (Hunnicutt, Daniel) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/28/2020 w/corrected document provided by filer) (hcic, ). Modified on 5/28/2020 to edit text(hcic, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Amy Kinard.(Hunnicutt, Daniel)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/28/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/11/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 6/11/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/6/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/8/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/5/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/5/2020, Discovery due by 12/4/2020, Motions due by 12/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/4/2021, Mediation Due by 2/17/2021, ADR Statement due by 1/16/2021. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to the date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 4/5/2021. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 5/8/2020. (hcic, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(swel, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(swel, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-26-02418. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9091104), filed by John Does 1-2, Walmart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(swel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinard v. Walmart Stores East LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East LP
Represented By: Rebecca Laffitte
Represented By: Rachel M Hutchens
Represented By: John M Montgomery
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Represented By: Rebecca Laffitte
Represented By: Rachel M Hutchens
Represented By: John M Montgomery
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Wenner
Represented By: Rebecca Laffitte
Represented By: Rachel M Hutchens
Represented By: John M Montgomery
Represented By: Vordman Carlisle Traywick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kinard
Represented By: Daniel Alan Hunnicutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?