Williams et al v. Progressive Flood Insurance Inc et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Williams and Larry Williams
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp and Progressive Flood Insurance Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01887
Filed: May 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 8/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/5/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/3/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/3/2020, Discovery due by 2/1/2021, Motions due by 2/16/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/3/2021, ADR Statement due by 3/19/2021, Mediation Due by 4/19/2021. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to the date set for trial. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for trial. This case is subject to being called for trial on or after 6/7/2021. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 7/6/2020. (hcic, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Strategic Insurance Corp.(Blackburn, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORPORATIONS ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by American Strategic Insurance Corp.(Blackburn, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Williams, Larry Williams re #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from the S.C. Dept. of Insurance)(Redman, George)
May 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp, Progressive Flood Insurance Inc. (swel, )
May 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Beverly Williams, Larry Williams.(swel, )
May 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp, Progressive Flood Insurance Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9104685.), filed by Larry Williams, Beverly Williams. Service due by 8/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - pictures of property, #2 Exhibit B - satellite view). #3 Exhibit C - letter from Venture Engineering) (swel, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Progressive Flood Insurance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Williams
Represented By: George W Redman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Williams
Represented By: George W Redman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Represented By: Charles G Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Flood Insurance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?