Williams v. Spartannash Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Melinda K Williams
Defendant: Spartannash Associates, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02646
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Melinda K Williams.(Prosser, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Spartannash Associates, LLC. (Thompson, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Florence County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Removal)(Thompson, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Spartannash Associates, LLC. (lgib, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Florence County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-21-1440 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9223387), filed by Spartannash Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Service of Process) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Spartannash Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda K Williams
Represented By: John M Prosser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartannash Associates, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D Thompson, III
Represented By: Daniel Richard Fuerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?