Mendoza v. Erckert et al
Plaintiff: Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak, a foreign corporation, Randall Erckert and Strawser Construction, Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv02963
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza TO DEFENDANT STRAWSER AND ECRKERTS' COMPLAINT. (Bell, James)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 11/6/2020 3:30 PM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/6/2020. (lgib, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/5/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/3/2021, Motions due by 4/19/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/14/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2021, Mediation Due by 5/3/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/06/2020. (lgib, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 9/30/2020. (lgib, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Camilo Diaz Avila ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359335) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace corrected document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ).
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mariano Garcia ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359322) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace with correct document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ).
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christian D. Searcy ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359295) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace corrected document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ).
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Randall Erckert, Strawser Construction, Inc.(Cobb, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Randall Erckert, Strawser Construction, Inc.(Cobb, David)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Randall Erckert served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Bell, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Randall Erckert. Service due by 11/23/2020. (lgib, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Strawser Construction, Inc. Service due by 11/16/2020. (lgib, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. (lgib, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randall Erckert, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Strawser Construction, Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9282176), filed by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Service due by 11/16/2020. (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Erckert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak, a foreign corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Erckert
Represented By: David Starr Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strawser Construction, Inc
Represented By: David Starr Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza
Represented By: Deloris King Cromartie
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Represented By: Juan Camilo Diaz Avila
Represented By: Mariano Garcia
Represented By: Christian Dietrich Searcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?