Gossett v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Gossett
Defendant: Mr. Anderson, Mrs. Terrie Wallace, Ms. Reaves and Mr. Whittington
Case Number: 4:2020cv02972
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendation by Samuel Gossett. Reply to Objections due by 10/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Samuel Gossett, #342165, KCI, 4344 BRR, Columbia, SC, 29210 (dsto, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case is dismissed without prejudice and any outstanding motions be dismissed as moot. It is recommended that the Clerk of Court close the file. Objections to R&R due by 10/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/30/2020. (dsto, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #5 Proper Form Order w/NEF, prisoner Complaint form, AO240, Fin.Cert, (4)Summons, (4)USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Samuel Gossett, #342165, KCI, 4344 BRR, Columbia, SC, 29210 (dsto, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/25/2020. (dsto, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Samuel Gossett. Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gossett v. Wallace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Terrie Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?