Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc et al v. McCall Farms, Inc
Plaintiff: CBOCS Distribution, Inc and Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc
Defendant: McCall Farms, Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv02988
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 11/6/2020 2:45 PM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/6/2020. (lgib, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/5/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/3/2021, Motions due by 4/19/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/14/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2021, Mediation Due by 5/3/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/06/2020. (lgib, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim #5 by CBOCS Distribution, Inc, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.(Quisenberry, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by McCall Farms, Inc.(Willcox, Walker)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by McCall Farms, Inc.(Willcox, Walker)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to McCall Farms, Inc. Service due by 11/23/2020. (lgib, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CBOCS Distribution, Inc, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. (lgib, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCall Farms, Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9286836), filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc, CBOCS Distribution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 Invoice 1-20-20, #3 Exhibit 3 Invoice 4-7-2020, #4 Exhibit 4 Invoice 7-8-2020) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc et al v. McCall Farms, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCall Farms, Inc
Represented By: Walker Heinitsh Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBOCS Distribution, Inc
Represented By: Brian Quisenberry
Represented By: Zachary Meade Kern
Represented By: Catherine Holland Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc
Represented By: Brian Quisenberry
Represented By: Zachary Meade Kern
Represented By: Catherine Holland Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?